Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021055

EP1021055 - Method for acquiring the characteristics of a mobile radio network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
T-Mobile Deutschland GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
[2002/30]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
DeTeMobil Deutsche Telekom MobilNet GmbH
Landgrabenweg 151
53227 Bonn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Brücken, Reinhold
Blankenheimer Strasse 11
50937 K-ln / DE
02 / Zingler, Olaf
Cäsariusstrasse 91 a
53639 K-nigswinter / DE
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/15]Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
Application number, filing date00100480.311.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateDE199910054311.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19900543
[2000/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1021055
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1021055
Date:04.07.2001
[2001/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021055
Date:02.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/36, H04B17/00
[2001/26]
Former International [2000/29]H04Q7/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Erfassung von Kenndaten eines Mobilfunknetzes[2000/29]
English:Method for acquiring the characteristics of a mobile radio network[2000/29]
French:Procédé d'enregistrement de données caractéristiques d'un réseau radiotéléphonique mobile[2000/29]
Examination procedure19.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
26.01.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2002Fee for grant paid
24.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY02.04.2003
FI02.04.2003
IE02.04.2003
DK02.07.2003
GR02.07.2003
PT02.07.2003
SE02.07.2003
[2007/08]
Former [2007/04]FI02.04.2003
IE02.04.2003
DK02.07.2003
GR02.07.2003
PT02.07.2003
SE02.07.2003
Former [2004/23]FI02.04.2003
DK02.07.2003
GR02.07.2003
PT02.07.2003
SE02.07.2003
Former [2004/05]FI02.04.2003
GR02.07.2003
PT02.07.2003
SE02.07.2003
Former [2004/02]GR02.07.2003
PT02.07.2003
SE02.07.2003
Former [2004/01]PT02.07.2003
SE02.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE02.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0946007  (WANDEL & GOLTERMANN MANAGEMENT [DE]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [XA]EP0619687  (ALCATEL STR AG [CH]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5;
 [A]EP0544635  (TELEVERKET [SE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]  EVANS T F, "Cellemetry/sup sm/-telemetry via cellular", DATABASE INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 5533005, XP002166295 [A] 5 * abstract *
    [] VIRGINIA TECH'S SIXTH SYMPOSIUM ON WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS. PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS OF 6TH VIRGINIA TECH SYMPOSIUM ON WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, BLACKSBURG, VA, USA, 5-7 JUNE 1996, 1996, Blacksburg, VA, USA, Virginia Tech, USA, pages 1/1 - 9,