EP1013175 - Sugarfree candied product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Südzucker Aktiengesellschaft Mannheim/Ochsenfurt Maximilianstrasse 10 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states SÜDZUCKER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT MANNHEIM/OCHSENFURT Maximilianstrasse 10 D-68165 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rapp, Knut, M. Im Kerner 16 67591 Offstein / DE | 02 /
Willibald-Ettle, Ingrid Arzheimer Strasse 36 76829 Landau / DE | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Schrell, Andreas, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Schrell, Andreas, Dr., et al Gleiss & Grosse, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Maybachstrasse 6 A 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100696.4 | 24.08.1996 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | DE1995132396 | 02.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19532396 | [2000/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013175 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013175 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/00, A23L1/236 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
A23G3/42 (EP,US);
A23G3/2092 (EP,US);
A23G3/26 (EP,US);
A23G3/343 (EP,US);
A23G3/346 (EP,US);
A23G3/38 (EP,US);
A23G3/54 (EP,US);
A23G4/10 (EP,US);
A23L27/34 (EP,US);
A61K31/7032 (EP,US);
A23G2200/06 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/2826 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23G3/343, A23G2200/06 (EP,US);
A23G3/346, A23G2200/06 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/22, A23V2250/6412, A23V2250/5028 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | A23G3/00, A23G3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | Zuckerfreie dragierte Produkte | [2000/26] | English: | Sugarfree candied product | [2000/26] | French: | Produit dragéifié sans sucre | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 12.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 11.04.2009 | Appeal received No. T1567/09 | 19.06.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.06.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 01.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.06.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96930096.1 / EP0847242 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960930096) is 28.01.2000 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 26.04.2012 | LU | 24.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/16] | GR | 26.04.2012 | |
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 26.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62148496 ; | [Y]US4317838 (CHERUKURI SUBRAMAN R, et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 2, line 60 - line 65; claim 1 * * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 34 *; | [A]DE3715919 (PFEIFER & LANGEN [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 37; claims 1,3,4 *; | [YD]US4792453 (REED MICHAEL A [US], et al) [YD] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0328849 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO8907895 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US]) [Y] 1 * claims 1,16,17 *; | [Y]US4961935 (CHERUKURI SUBRAMAN R [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column W *; | [A]EP0431376 (HAARMANN & REIMER CORP [US]) [A] * column W *; | [A]WO9213866 (GRILLO WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0625578 (SUEDZUCKER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9,15-19 * column W *; | [DA]EP0625311 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]); | [Y]WO9507622 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,15-19 * page 1, lines 9-13; examples 1-4; claim - * * page 13, lines 27-33 * * page 6, lines 5-9 * * page 10, lines 32-37 * * page 18, line 13 - page 19, line 36 *; | [AP]DE19523008 (GADOT BIOCHEMICAL IND LTD [IL]) [AP] 1,10,11,17 * the whole document *; | [YP]US5525360 (YATKA ROBERT J [US], et al) [YP] 1 * column 4, lines 14-19 * * column 5, line 24 - line 51 * * column 6, line 57 - line 63 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 48, Database accession no. 87-337070, XP002022953 & JPS62148496 A 19870702 (MITSUI SEITO) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 48, Database accession no. 87-337070, XP002022954 & JPS62148496 A 19870702 (MITSUI SEITO) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | US4792453 | EP0625311 | US5376389 |