Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022843

EP1022843 - High power rectifier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.09.2009  [2009/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rockwell Science Center, LLC
1049 Camino Dos Rios, P.O. Box 1085
Thousand Oaks, CA 91358-0085 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
Rockwell Science Center, LLC
1049 Camino Dos Rios, P.O. Box 1085
Thousand Oaks, CA 91358-0085 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chang, Hsueh-Rong
629 Lynwood Street
Thousand Oaks, California 91360 / US
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Wächtershäuser, Günter , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwälte
Ottostrasse 4
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]Wächtershäuser, Günter , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/30]Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. , et al
Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date00100735.014.01.2000
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateUS1999023278719.01.1999         Original published format: US 232787
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022843
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022843
Date:31.01.2001
[2001/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02M1/00, H01L29/872
[2001/05]
Former International [2000/30]H02M1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/30]
TitleGerman:Hochleistungsgleichrichter[2000/30]
English:High power rectifier[2000/30]
French:Redresseur à haute puissance[2000/30]
Examination procedure28.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
02.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/49]
20.07.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
29.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19801999  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,11,12,14 * column 12, line 60 - column 13, line 53; figure 4 * * column 22, lines 25-29 * [Y] 22;
 [Y]US5469041  (BOURGEOIS JEAN-MARIE [FR]) [Y] 22 * column W *;
 [X]US4982260  (CHANG HSUEH-RONG [US], et al) [X] 1,11,12,14 * column 8, line 34 - column 10, line 10; figure 14B *;
 [X]JPH0563184  ;
 [A]US5612567  (BALIGA BANTVAL J [US]) [A] 1-20 * column W *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930715), vol. 017, no. 378, Database accession no. (E - 1398), [X] 1,11 * abstract *