Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020949

EP1020949 - A compact folded optics antenna system for providing adjacent, high gain antenna beams [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  10.06.2005
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2005Refusal of applicationpublished on 27.07.2005  [2005/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION
1840 Century Park East Los Angeles
CA 90067-2199 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/49]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Corporation
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US
Former [2003/47]For all designated states
Northrop Grumman Corporation
1840 Century Park East
Los Angeles, CA 90067-2177 / US
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
TRW Inc.
One Space Park
Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Broas, Romulo F.
332 West 229th Street
Carson, CA 90745 / US
02 / Brundrett, David L.
10927 Lindblade Street
Culver City, CA 90230 / US
03 / Chandler, Charles W.
119 South California Street, 5
San Gabriel, CA 91776 / US
04 / Wu, Te-Kao
26911 Spring Creek Road
Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date00100749.114.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateUS1999023245415.01.1999         Original published format: US 232454
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020949
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020949
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01Q15/16
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Kompaktes gefaltetes, optisches Antennensystem, das nebeneinander liegende Strahlungskeulen mit hoher Verstärkung liefert[2000/29]
English:A compact folded optics antenna system for providing adjacent, high gain antenna beams[2000/29]
French:Système d'antenne optique compacte et pliable fournissant des faisceaux adjacents à grand gain[2000/29]
Examination procedure26.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/34]
05.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/30]
05.03.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5576721  (HWANG YEONGMING [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 8, line 11 - column 9, line 54; figures 8,9 *;
 [A]EP0837524  (LORAL SPACE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * column W *;
 [A]EP0795928  (SPACE ENGINEERING SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0353846  (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4618866  (MAKINO SHIGERU [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column W *;
 [A]US4482897  (DRAGONE CORRADO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column W *;
 [A]US4439773  (CHU TA-SHING [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 11; figures 1,2 *