Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020732

EP1020732 - Procedure and apparatus for testing the function of a multitude of active microstructure elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.01.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 24.11.2010  [2010/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETEC EBT GmbH
Philip-Hauck-Strasse 6
85622 Feldkirchen / DE
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Brunner, Matthias, Dr.
Graf- Andechs-Strasse 30
85551 Kirchheim / DE
02 / Schmid, Ralf, Dr.
Betunienweg 9
85586 Poing / DE
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
Former [2001/39]Zimmermann & Partner
Postfach 33 09 20
80069 München / DE
Former [2000/29]Tetzner, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Van-Gogh-Strasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date00100915.818.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateDE199910176718.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19901767
[2000/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020732
Date:19.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020732
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1020732
Date:12.03.2008
Language:DE
[2008/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/307, G01R31/311, G01N23/225, H01L21/66
[2001/20]
Former International [2000/29]G01R31/307
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Testen der Funktion einer Vielzahl von aktiven Mikrostrukturbauelementen[2000/29]
English:Procedure and apparatus for testing the function of a multitude of active microstructure elements[2000/29]
French:Procédé et appareil de test du fonctionnement d'une pluralité d'elements microstructurels actifs[2000/29]
Examination procedure15.05.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/28]
19.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2008Fee for grant paid
25.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
IT12.03.2008
NL12.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
GR13.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT14.08.2008
[2010/47]
Former [2009/42]CY12.03.2008
DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
IT12.03.2008
NL12.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT14.08.2008
Former [2009/39]DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
IT12.03.2008
NL12.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT14.08.2008
Former [2009/08]DK12.03.2008
FI12.03.2008
IE12.03.2008
NL12.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT14.08.2008
Former [2009/01]FI12.03.2008
NL12.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT14.08.2008
Former [2008/49]FI12.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
PT14.08.2008
Former [2008/46]FI12.03.2008
SE12.06.2008
ES23.06.2008
Former [2008/39]FI12.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5663967  (LINDBERG GRANT A [US], et al) [X] 1,11-13 * figure 2A; claims 1,2 * [Y] 5;
 [X]US5258706  (BRUNNER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 25; claims 1-6 *;
 [Y]US5057773  (GOLLADAY STEVEN D [US], et al) [Y] 5 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]US4695794  (BARGETT CHARLEY B [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11,12,15 * claims 1-23 *;
 [A]US4875004  (BOYD PHILLIP R [US]) [A] 11-15 * claims 1-7 *;
 [A]US5825191  (NIIJIMA HIRONOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,11 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 40 *