Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1026302

EP1026302 - Device for winding a nonwoven mat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Rockwool Mineralwoll GmbH & Co. OHG
Rockwool Strasse 37-41
45966 Gladbeck / DE
[2001/41]
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
Deutsche Rockwool Mineralwoll-GmbH
Rockwool Strasse 37-41
45966 Gladbeck / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klose, Gerd-Rüdiger, Dr.
Lembecker Strasse 75
46286 Dorsten / DE
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel
Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[2008/43]
Former [2000/32]Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel, Dipl.-Ing.
Rondorfer Strasse 5a
50968 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00100941.419.01.2000
[2000/32]
Priority number, dateDE199910412103.02.1999         Original published format: DE 19904121
DE199912335221.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19923352
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1026302
Date:09.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1026302
Date:25.09.2002
[2002/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1026302
Date:24.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/70
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/38]
Former [2003/24]BE,  DE,  FI,  FR,  GB,  NL,  SE 
Former [2000/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln eines Faservlieses[2000/32]
English:Device for winding a nonwoven mat[2000/32]
French:Dispositif pour enrouler une bande non-tissée[2000/32]
Examination procedure20.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/47]
09.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2003Fee for grant paid
10.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI24.03.2004
FR24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
IT24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
PT24.08.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]FI24.03.2004
FR24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
IT24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2006/14]FI24.03.2004
FR24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2006/13]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
NL24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2005/18]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
DK24.06.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2005/03]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
IE24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2005/02]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
ES05.07.2004
Former [2005/01]FI24.03.2004
GB24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI24.03.2004
GR24.06.2004
SE24.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI24.03.2004
SE24.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8501278  (BALZER PETER) [A] 1,10 * Ansprüche 1,2,4,5,6;; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE2516226  (MUELLER FORST C KG) [A] 1,2,5 * Ganzes Dokument *;
 [AD]US3964232  (BENDER DAVID JOHN, et al) [AD] 1 * Ganzes Dokument *;
 [A]EP0949172  (TECHINT SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5 * Ganzes Dokument *;
 [A]FR2731687  (TICTOR SA [FR]) [A] 11 * Ganzes Dokument *;
 [A]US5832696  (NAGY GABOR [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11 * Ganzes Dokument *;
 [A]FR2685904  (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [A] 1,2,11 * Ganzes Dokument *;
 [A]EP0131475  (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [A] 1,13-15 * Ganzes Dokument *