Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022465

EP1022465 - Hydraulically driven diaphragm pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.05.2002  [2002/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEWA Herbert Ott GmbH + Co.
Ulmer Strasse 10
71229 Leonberg / DE
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Heimüller, Ralph
Keltschstrasse 4
91058 Erlangen / DE
02 / Schlücker, Eberhard, Dr.
Im Kirchacker 15
74182 Obersulm / DE
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Zeitler, Giselher
Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 26 02 51
80059 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Zeitler, Giselher, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Zeitler & Dickel Postfach 26 02 51
80059 München / DE
Application number, filing date00100956.218.01.2000
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateDE199910189319.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19901893
[2000/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022465
Date:26.07.2000
Language:DE
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022465
Date:27.12.2000
[2000/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:F04B43/00
[2000/30]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/37]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Membranpumpe mit hydraulisch angetriebener Membran[2000/30]
English:Hydraulically driven diaphragm pump[2000/30]
French:Pompe à membrane à commande hydraulique[2000/30]
Examination procedure28.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/18]
09.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/18]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.08.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001GB   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.08.2001M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]FR787226  (CORBLIN H.) [A] 1 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 93; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]US1927617  (RUDOLF SCHMIDT) [A] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 62 - line 94 *;
 [A]JPH09286659  ;
 [A]GB540036  (VICKERS INC) [A] 1 * page 2, line 94 - line 104 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, [A] 1 * abstract *