Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1024036

EP1024036 - Trailer coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.03.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change - applicantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACPS Automotive GmbH
Steinbeisstrasse 6
71706 Markgröningen / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2018/02]For all designated states
Bosal ACPS Holding 2 B.V.
Kamerlingh Onnesweg 5
4131 PK Vianen / NL
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited
17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street
3106 Limassol / CY
Former [2014/23]For all designated states
SCAMBIA Industrial Developments Aktiengesellschaft
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
SCAMBIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENTS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE HANS RIEHLE GmbH
Im Bornrain
71696 Möglingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Riehle, Hans
Salonallee 17
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
02 / Fischer, Michael
Michaelsbergstrasse 1
71679 Asperg / DE
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/23]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/31]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00100977.819.01.2000
[2000/31]
Priority number, dateDE1999100235521.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19902355
[2000/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1024036
Date:02.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1024036
Date:04.06.2014
Language:DE
[2014/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/54, B60D1/52
[2000/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
TitleGerman:Anhängekupplung[2000/31]
English:Trailer coupling[2000/31]
French:Attelage de remorque[2000/31]
Examination procedure31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
10.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.09.2013Fee for grant paid
30.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
23.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10182472.0  / EP2272692
EP16207130.2  / EP3168069
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.04.2003
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.03.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
 [2016/17]
Former [2015/15]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2015  05.03.2015  ADMISSIBLE
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Bregenzer, Michael
Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule
Partnerschaftgesellschaft mbB
Neckarstraße 47
73728 Esslingen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
15.04.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
28.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.03.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition23.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1231/17
17.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
23.04.2014Request for further processing filed
23.04.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.05.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.05.2011Request for further processing filed
25.05.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.06.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
28.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
18.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
23.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
26.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 14
30.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
AT19.01.2015
IE19.01.2015
LU19.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
[2016/25]
Former [2016/07]CY04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
IE19.01.2015
LU19.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/47]CY04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU19.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/43]CY04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
MC04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU19.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/39]CY04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
LU19.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/30]CY04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY04.06.2014
DK04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
IT04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/12]CY04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
NL04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
PT06.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY04.06.2014
ES04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
SE04.06.2014
GR05.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY04.06.2014
FI04.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY04.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE19612959  (ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE RIEHLE H [DE]) [AD] * figures 1-10 *;
 [AD]DE19654867  (CARTRON FAHRZEUGTEILE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE3328524  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE19711535  (CARTRON FAHRZEUGTEILE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *;
 [PA]WO9915349  (RINGFEDER VBG GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1 * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]DE964834  (WERNER HARKORT) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2450167  (OPPERMANN RENE) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *
by applicantDE19711535
 DE19654867