Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1023965

EP1023965 - High current welding power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.12.2010
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2010Revocation of patentpublished on 05.01.2011  [2011/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lincoln Global, Inc.
22801 St. Clair Avenue
Cleveland
Ohio 44117-1199 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
LINCOLN GLOBAL, INC.
22801 St. Clair Avenue
Cleveland, Ohio 44117-1199 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Stava, Elliott K.
8484 Eaton Drive
Sagamore Hills, Ohio 44067 / US
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/20]GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
Former [2000/31]Schumacher, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
König-Palgen-Schumacher-Kluin Patentanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date00100986.919.01.2000
[2000/31]
Priority number, dateUS1999023323519.01.1999         Original published format: US 233235
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1023965
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1023965
Date:26.06.2002
[2002/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1023965
Date:23.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP13.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/09, B23K9/10
[2002/26]
Former International [2000/31]B23K9/09
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
Extension statesAL20.12.2002
LT20.12.2002
LV20.12.2002
MK20.12.2002
RO20.12.2002
SI20.12.2002
TitleGerman:Starkstromversorgung zum Schweissen[2000/31]
English:High current welding power supply[2000/31]
French:Alimentation de courant elevé pour soudage[2000/31]
Examination procedure20.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
02.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2004Fee for grant paid
23.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.12.2005  05.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
Esab AB
Box 8004
402 77 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Berglund, Stefan, et al
Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB
P.O. Box 5366
102 49 Stockholm / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/07]
Opponent(s)01  23.12.2005   
Esab AB
Box 8004
402 77 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Berglund, Stefan, et al
Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58
114 50 Stockholm / SE
27.01.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.09.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.12.2007Date of oral proceedings
02.01.2008Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.01.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
21.01.2010Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/01]
Appeal following opposition12.03.2008Appeal received No.  T0539/08
13.05.2008Statement of grounds filed
21.01.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
21.01.2010Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
CY23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE19.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
GB19.01.2009
ES20.01.2009
FR02.02.2009
DK31.07.2009
NL01.08.2009
[2010/35]
Former [2010/21]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
CY23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE19.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
GB19.01.2009
ES20.01.2009
FR02.02.2009
NL01.08.2009
Former [2010/19]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
CY23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE19.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
GB19.01.2009
ES20.01.2009
NL01.08.2009
Former [2010/01]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
CY23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE19.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
GB19.01.2009
NL01.08.2009
Former [2009/50]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
CY23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE19.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
NL01.08.2009
Former [2009/02]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
CY23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE19.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
Former [2007/08]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE19.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
Former [2006/48]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
IE19.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
Former [2006/44]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
MC31.01.2006
Former [2006/14]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
GR23.06.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/12]BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
Former [2005/51]BE23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
Former [2005/46]FI23.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4947021  (STAVA ELLIOTT K [US]) [X] 31,34,37,39,40 * column 6, lines 6-10 * * column 8, line 45 - column 13, line 9; figures 2,7 * [Y] 1-18,21-26,29,30,32,33,35,38;
 [Y]US4877941  (HONMA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-18,21-26,29,30,32,33,35,38 * column 4, line 32 - column 9, line 68; figures 1A-D,5 *;
 [XA]US4897522  (BILCZO DALE L [US], et al) [X] 31,34,37,39 * column 6, line 2 - column 8, line 54; figures 1,5 * [A] 1,21,29;
 [XDA]US5351175  (BLANKENSHIP GEORGE D [US]) [XD] 31,34,37,39 * column W * [A] 1,21,29;
 [Y]EP0316936  (BABCOCK HITACHI KK [JP]) [Y] 12,35 * page 3, columns 37-41; figures 2,6 *;
 [Y]US5464958  (FLOWERS GILBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 17,18,35,38 * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 34; figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [A]  MECKE H ET AL, "SCHNELLE ELEKTRONISCHE SPEISEQUELLEN FUER SCHWEISSLICHTBOEGEN", ELEKTRIE, VEB VERLAG TECHNIK. BERLIN, DD, (1994), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0013-5399, pages 143 - 150, XP000456369 [A] 1-40 * the whole document *