EP1024507 - Ceramic electronic part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2007/37] |
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Kazuhiro Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Moriwaki, Nobushige Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 03 /
Kubota, Yasuhiko Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101012.3 | 19.01.2000 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | JP19990021069 | 29.01.1999 Original published format: JP 2106999 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024507 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/228, H01G4/232 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
H01G4/232 (EP,US);
H01G2/065 (EP,US);
H01G4/228 (EP,US);
H05K3/3426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/16] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Keramisches elektronisches Bauteil | [2000/31] | English: | Ceramic electronic part | [2000/31] | French: | Elément électronique en céramique | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 24.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/27] | 24.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04188808 ; | [X]JPH1140460 ; | [A]JPH09148174 ; | [A]JPH08273976 ; | [A]US4158218 (HUCKS WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 4 - line 10 * * column 1, line 25 - line 33 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0243602 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE19830820 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1,3 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921020), vol. 016, no. 508, Database accession no. (E - 1282), & JP04188808 A 19920707 (MARCON ELECTRON CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11040460 A 19990212 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09148174 A 19970606 (ROHM CO LTD) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08273976 A 19961018 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract * | Examination | JPH04188810 |