Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022089

EP1022089 - Method and plant for trimming, grinding and finishing metal workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMF S.r.l.
Via Turati, 110/1
21016 Luino (Varese) / IT
[2005/33]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
FONDERIE ADDA DI E. FUMAGALLI & C. SRL
VIA CONCORDIA, 20
23854 OLGINATE (LC) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Fumagalli, Franco
Via Grigne, 1
23808 Vercurago (LC) / IT
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Valentini, Giuliano
Marietti Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l.
Via Larga 16
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2004/22]Valentini, Giuliano
Marietti Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16
20122 Milano / IT
Former [2000/30]Gislon, Gabriele
Marietti e Gislon S.r.l. Via Larga, 16
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00101058.620.01.2000
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateIT1999LC0000122.01.1999         Original published format: IT LC990001
[2000/30]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022089
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022089
Date:13.11.2002
[2002/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1022089
Date:21.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23Q3/154, B24B41/06, B25B11/00, // B24B9/00
[2002/46]
Former International [2000/30]B23Q3/154, // B24B9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Anlage zum Entgraten, Schleifen und Endbearbeiten von Metallwerkstücken[2000/30]
English:Method and plant for trimming, grinding and finishing metal workpieces[2000/30]
French:Procédé et installation pour ébarber, meuler et finir des pièces métalliques[2000/30]
Examination procedure25.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
08.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2005Fee for grant paid
08.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200506   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2005
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
CY21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
FR21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
DE22.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
GB20.01.2006
IE20.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2007/11]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
DE22.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
GB20.01.2006
IE20.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2007/08]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
DE22.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
IE20.01.2006
LU31.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/48]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
DE22.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
IE20.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/44]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
DE22.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
MC31.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/36]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
DE22.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/34]AT21.09.2005
BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
DK21.12.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/33]BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
ES01.01.2006
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/25]BE21.09.2005
CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
PT21.02.2006
Former [2006/22]CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
NL21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
Former [2006/14]CH21.09.2005
FI21.09.2005
LI21.09.2005
GR21.12.2005
SE21.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI21.09.2005
SE21.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0254939  (CARDONE TECNOMAGNETICA [IT]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 3-12,16-25;
 [XA]JPS60144914  (FUJI JIKO KK) [X] 1,2,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 3-12,16-25;
 [XA]JPS57149130  (MITSUBISHI STEEL MAGNETICS) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2-12,14-25;
 [XA]EP0554017  (ECLIPSE MAGNETICS LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2-12,14-25;
 [XA]EP0345554  (TECNOMAGNETE SPA [IT]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2-12,14-25;
 [XA]US4075589  (BRAILLON PHILIBERT MAURICE) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2-12,14-25;
 [XA]US4090162  (CARDONE MICHELE, et al) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2-12,14-25;
 [XA]DE19530397  (SAV SPANN UND AUTOMATISATIONSS [DE]) [X] 1,13 * column 7, line 9 - column 7, line 16 * [A] 2-12,14-25