blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1021998 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1021998



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 158
23.02.2004 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
11.11.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
25.08.2003 Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
02.07.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.01.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.11.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
19.11.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.11.2002 European search report Search / examination 3
10.09.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
10.09.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.09.2002 European search report Search / examination 2
10.09.2002 Supplemental sheet B (lack of unity of invention) Search / examination 1
06.02.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.06.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
29.02.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.02.2000 Priority document Search / examination 14
29.02.2000 Priority document Search / examination 11
23.02.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
23.02.2000 Description Search / examination 10
23.02.2000 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 16
25.01.2000 Drawings Search / examination 17
25.01.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
25.01.2000 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 18
21.01.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
21.01.2000 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 35