blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1021998


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.02.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  14.04.2004  [2004/16]
05.12.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
05.12.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
05.11.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
19.08.2003 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
19.08.2003 New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit
08.08.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  24.09.2003  [2003/39]
11.07.2003 Change - divisional application(s) published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
10.02.2003 Renewal fee
15.11.2002 Publication of search report published on  02.01.2003  [2003/01]
06.09.2002 Change - classification published on  23.10.2002  [2002/43]
21.02.2002 Renewal fee
09.06.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.07.2000 [2000/30]