blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1021998 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP00101163 EP03015005



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1348399Global Dossier 01.10.2003A1
Priority number Date
ITMO990004 21.01.1999
ITMO990224 15.10.1999
EP00101163 21.01.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT1310856 22.02.2002B1
ITMO990224 16.04.2001A1
ITMO990224D 15.10.1999D0
Priority number Date
ITMO990224 15.10.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IT1310897 27.02.2002B1
ITMO990004 21.07.2000A1
ITMO990004D 21.01.1999D0
Priority number Date
ITMO990004 21.01.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1021998Global Dossier 02.01.2003A3
EP1021998 26.07.2000A2
Priority number Date
ITMO990004 21.01.1999
ITMO990224 15.10.1999
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1348399