Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021998

EP1021998 - Connection for dental prostheses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.04.2004  [2004/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cattaneo, Alessandro
Via Sassari, 77
09124 Cagliari / IT
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Luppi, Luigi
Luppi Crugnola & Partners S.r.l. Viale Corassori 54
41100 Modena / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Luppi, Luigi
Luppi & Crugnola S.r.l. Viale Corassori, 54
41100 Modena / IT
Application number, filing date00101163.421.01.2000
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateIT1999MO0000421.01.1999         Original published format: IT MO990004
IT1999MO0022415.10.1999         Original published format: IT MO990224
[2000/30]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1021998
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1021998
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/265, A61C13/277
[2002/43]
Former International [2000/30]A61C13/265
Designated contracting states[2003/39]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbindung für Zahnprothesen[2000/30]
English:Connection for dental prostheses[2000/30]
French:Connexion pour prothèses dentaires[2000/30]
Examination procedure03.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/16]
11.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/16]
Divisional application(s)EP03015005.6  / EP1348399
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.08.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.08.2003M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE19619786  (VIGANO ARNO [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,16-18,20,21 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 22 * * column 6, line 54 - column 8, line 59 * * figures 1-12 * [A] 6,8,19,22;
 [XA]DE2443584  (HAKER GERD) [X] 1-3,5,16 * page 5, lines 3-5 * * page 7, lines 4-14 * * page 7, line 30 - page 8, line 21 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 7;
 [XA]DE19729995  (VIGANO ARNO [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8,16-18 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 18 * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 39 * * figures 1-9E * [A] 21;
 [A]DE1491044  (NARBONI VICTOR ELIE) [A] 1-4,7,8,16-18,21,22 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 1; figure 3 *
by applicantUS5564434
 US4256094
 US3926179
 US4802488
 US479949
 US4269193
 US5005574
 US4803987
 US5596986