EP1119215 - Device for optimally processing information during packet-oriented data transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Sichart, Frithjof, Dr. rer. nat. Karl-Theodor-Strasse 72 80803 München / DE | [2001/30] | Application number, filing date | 00101181.6 | 21.01.2000 | [2001/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119215 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP);
H04L2012/5681 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/16] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum optimierten Bearbeiten von Informationen bei einer paketorientierten Übertragung | [2001/30] | English: | Device for optimally processing information during packet-oriented data transmission | [2001/30] | French: | Dispositif de traitement optimal d'informations dans une transmission des données | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/48] | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.03.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.03.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.03.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2321821 (NEILL EUGENE O [IE], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 4 * * page 18, line 6 - page 19, line 19 * [Y] 5; | [Y]US5809252 (BEIGHE EDWARD W [US], et al) [Y] 5 * figure 3 * * column 4, line 42 - line 47 * |