EP1029648 - Method and blow moulding tool for the manufacture of blow moulded parts having a decorative layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Möller Plast GmbH Kupferhammer 33649 Bielefeld / DE | [2000/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wrobbel, Werner Drosselweg 22 33335 Gütersloh / DE | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Schirmer, Siegfried Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Schirmer, Siegfried Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Detmolderstrasse 235 33605 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2000/34] | Schirmer, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Boehmert & Boehmert, Patentanwalt, Osningstrasse 10 33605 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101213.7 | 21.01.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | DE1999106338 | 16.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19906338 | [2000/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1029648 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1029648 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029648 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/10, B29C51/16, B29C49/24, B29C49/18, B29C63/06 | [2002/29] | CPC: |
B29C63/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/18 (EP,US);
B29C49/24 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2412 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2433 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2441 (EP,US);
B29C2049/2472 (EP,US);
B29C2791/001 (EP,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3006 (EP);
B29C45/00 (EP,US);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/34] | B29C51/10, B29C51/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Blasformwerkzeug zur Herstellung von Blasformteilen mit einer Dekorbeschichtung | [2000/34] | English: | Method and blow moulding tool for the manufacture of blow moulded parts having a decorative layer | [2000/34] | French: | Methode et outil de moulage par soufflage pour le fabrication de pieces soufflées ayant un revêtement decoratif | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 17.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.03.2004 | IE | 24.03.2004 | IT | 24.03.2004 | NL | 24.03.2004 | DK | 24.06.2004 | GR | 24.06.2004 | SE | 24.06.2004 | ES | 05.07.2004 | PT | 24.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
IE | 24.03.2004 | ||
IT | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
IE | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
IE | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
IE | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
SE | 24.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02179721 ; | [YA]US3072969 (DU BOIS JOHN H) [Y] 1-7,9,10,13-15 * column 1, lines 8-19; figure 2 * * column 2, line 38 - line 41 * * the whole document * [A] 8,11,12,16-18; | [Y]US4323411 (UHLIG ALBERT R) [Y] 1-7,9,10,13-15 * abstract * * column 2, line 8 - line 32 * * column 4, line 30 - column 5, line 53 *; | [YA]EP0369023 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7,9,10,13-15 * page 1, line 21 - line 28; figure 2 * * the whole document * [A] 8,11,12,16-18; | [A]US5804127 (TAKATORI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 26 - line 44; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900927), vol. 014, no. 450, Database accession no. (M - 1030), & JP02179721 A 19900712 (DAIKYO INC) [A] 1-18 * abstract * |