Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1000801

EP1000801 - Loading tail gate system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2006Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 12.04.2006  [2006/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sörensen Hydraulik Zweigniederlassung, Ulfborg, Filial af Sörensen Hydraulik GmbH, Tyskland
Industriarealet 54
6990 Ulfborg / DK
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Sörensen Hydraulik Zweigniederlassung, Ulfborg, Filial af Sörensen Hydraulik GmbH, Tyskland
Industriarealet 54
6990 Ulfborg / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Jensen, Jens Herman
Industriarealet 60
6990 Ulfborg / DK
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Niedmers, Ole
propindus
Patentanwälte
NIEDMERS JAEGER KÖSTER
Van-der-Smissen-Strasse 3
22767 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Niedmers, Ole, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwälte, Niedmers & Seemann, Van-der-Smissen-Strasse 3
22767 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date00101236.821.05.1996
[2000/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1000801
Date:17.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1000801
Date:26.11.2003
Language:DE
[2003/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60P1/44
[2000/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/20]
TitleGerman:Ladebordwandsystem[2000/20]
English:Loading tail gate system[2000/20]
French:Système de hayon élévateur[2000/20]
Examination procedure18.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
18.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2003Fee for grant paid
24.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96108052.0  / EP0808747
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.08.2004  17.10.2005  WITHDRAWN
Gerd Bär GmbH
Pfaffenstrasse 7
74078 Heibronn / DE
Opponent's representative
Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/49]
Opponent(s)01  18.08.2004  17.10.2005  WITHDRAWN
Gerd Bär GmbH
Pfaffenstrasse 7
74078 Heibronn / DE
Opponent's representative
Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2004/42]
Opponent(s)01  18.08.2004   
Gerd Bär GmbH
Pfaffenstrasse 7
74078 Heibronn / DE
Opponent's representative
KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
30.09.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.02.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.11.2005Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
21.11.2005Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
DK26.02.2004
SE26.02.2004
[2004/41]
Former [2004/33]FI26.11.2003
NL26.11.2003
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/26]FI26.11.2003
SE26.02.2004
Former [2004/24]SE26.02.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2654286  (DAUTEL EMIL KIPPERBAU) [A] 1-19 * page 32, line 19 - page 35, line 5; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE3228829  (DAUTEL EMIL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3228765  (DAUTEL EMIL GMBH [DE])
Examination   Super Mover 1500, Produktions AB Hydro Lif, Torshälla, Schweden, XP002962648