blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1024331 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1024331



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 520
31.07.2008 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
24.07.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.07.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.07.2008 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 15
26.06.2008 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
27.05.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.05.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.05.2008 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.05.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
20.05.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.05.2008 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
16.05.2008 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
06.03.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.02.2008 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.02.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 14
13.02.2008 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 14
07.02.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.02.2008 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
19.12.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 20
19.12.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 40
15.12.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 4
18.10.2006 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
18.10.2006 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
16.10.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.10.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.10.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.10.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.10.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
10.10.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.07.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.07.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.07.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
15.07.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
05.07.2006 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.06.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.06.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.06.2006 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.06.2006 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.06.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
03.06.2006 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
03.06.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.06.2006 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
03.06.2006 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
03.06.2006 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
03.06.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
03.06.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
03.06.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
03.06.2006 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
02.06.2006 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
03.05.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
03.05.2006 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
07.04.2006 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
31.03.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
31.03.2006 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.03.2006 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
01.03.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.02.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.02.2006 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
01.02.2006 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
01.02.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 6
01.02.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.02.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.02.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.02.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
01.02.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2005 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Claims Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Claims Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Claims Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Claims Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Claims Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Claims Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Claims Opposition 1
08.11.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
28.10.2005 Claims Opposition 1
28.10.2005 Claims Opposition 1
28.10.2005 Claims Opposition 1
28.10.2005 Claims Opposition 1
28.10.2005 Claims Opposition 1
28.10.2005 Claims Opposition 1
28.10.2005 Claims Opposition 1
28.10.2005 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.09.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
09.09.2005 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
29.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.07.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.07.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.07.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.07.2005 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
06.07.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.07.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.06.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
29.06.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
29.06.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
29.06.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
07.06.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.11.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.11.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
08.11.2004 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
08.07.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
08.07.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.06.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.06.2004 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
01.06.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.06.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
01.06.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
01.06.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
31.05.2004 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
31.05.2004 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
31.05.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
31.05.2004 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
24.07.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.06.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.06.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
23.06.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.06.2003 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.06.2003 Translation of priority document Search / examination 9
18.03.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
18.03.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.03.2003 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
18.03.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
06.02.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
06.02.2003 Description Search / examination 2
06.02.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.02.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
21.10.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.09.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
23.09.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.05.2002 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 11
14.01.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.11.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.10.2001 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.10.2001 European search report Search / examination 1
25.06.2001 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
23.05.2001 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.06.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Priority document Search / examination 15
26.01.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Description Search / examination 5
26.01.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Drawings Search / examination 2
26.01.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.01.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7