blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1024331


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
11.01.2019 Change - classification published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
09.02.2018 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
16.04.2010 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  19.05.2010  [2010/20]
01.08.2008 Opposition rejected published on  03.09.2008  [2008/36]
09.07.2008 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
24.06.2008 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.02.2008 Change: Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2008 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.07.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2007  [2007/34]
19.01.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.02.2007  [2007/08]
13.06.2006 Change: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
13.06.2006 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
05.04.2006 Change: Appeal number
01.04.2006 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
28.01.2006 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.01.2006 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
16.09.2005 Change - representative published on  02.11.2005  [2005/44]
01.07.2005 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
03.12.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.01.2005  [2005/03]
26.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
17.11.2004 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
05.07.2004 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
11.06.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
11.06.2004 Opposition filed published on  28.07.2004  [2004/31]
07.06.2004 Unpublished change to opponent data
09.04.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.05.2004  [2004/22]
27.02.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.04.2004  [2004/16]
13.02.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.03.2004  [2004/14]
30.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.03.2004  [2004/12]
18.07.2003 (Expected) grant published on  03.09.2003  [2003/36]
28.06.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
28.06.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
10.03.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.03.2003 Change - French title published on  23.04.2003  [2003/17]
15.02.2003 Change - German title published on  02.04.2003  [2003/14]
13.02.2003 Examination report or reply
05.02.2003 Renewal fee
18.10.2002 Change - applicant published on  04.12.2002  [2002/49]
21.09.2002 First examination report
18.09.2002 Examination report or reply
14.06.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  31.07.2002  [2002/31]
08.02.2002 Request for examination filed published on  27.03.2002  [2002/13]
04.02.2002 Change - extension states
14.01.2002 Renewal fee
28.09.2001 Publication of search report published on  14.11.2001 [2001/46]
16.06.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.08.2000 [2000/31]