Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1024331

EP1024331 - Flush-mount enclosure, particularly for making provisions for air-conditioning systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  01.08.2008
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tecnosystemi S.P.A.
Via Mattei
31029 Vittorio Veneto (Treviso) / IT
[2002/49]
Former [2000/31]For all designated states
Tecnosystemi S.r.l.
Vicolo Cadore, 10
31020 San Vendemiano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Rigoni, Giorgio
Via Monticano, 14
31015 Conegliano (Treviso) / IT
[2000/31]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2005/44]Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16
20123 Milano / IT
Former [2000/31]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00101271.526.01.2000
[2000/31]
Priority number, dateIT1999TV0001228.01.1999         Original published format: IT TV990012
[2000/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1024331
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1024331
Date:14.11.2001
[2001/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1024331
Date:03.09.2003
Language:EN
[2003/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:F24F1/00, F24F13/22
[2000/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/31]
TitleGerman:Eingebautes Gehäuse, insbesondere für Klimaanlagen[2003/14]
English:Flush-mount enclosure, particularly for making provisions for air-conditioning systems[2000/31]
French:Boîtier de montage encastré, en particulier pour systèmes de conditionnement d'air[2003/17]
Former [2000/31]Gehäuse zum Einbau einer versenkten Spüle, insbesondere für Klimaanlagen
Former [2000/31]Boîtier de montage d'un évier, en particulier pour protéger les systèmes de conditionnement d'air
Examination procedure14.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/13]
23.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2003Fee for grant paid
16.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.05.2004  09.06.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Pignolo, Nicola
Via Bezzecca, 26
36100 Vicenza / IT
Opponent's representative
Bonini, Ercole, et al
Studio Bonini Srl
Corso Fogazzaro, 8
36100 Vicenza / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2004/31]
Opponent(s)01  31.05.2004  09.06.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Pignolo, Nicola
Via Bezzecca, 26
36100 Vicenza / IT
Opponent's representative
Bonini, Ercole, et al
c/o STUDIO ING. E. BONINI SRL Corso Fogazzaro 8
36100 Vicenza / IT
08.07.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.11.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
01.02.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.02.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
18.06.2008Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/36]
Appeal following opposition30.03.2006Appeal received No.  T0476/06
02.06.2006Statement of grounds filed
18.06.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
18.06.2008Date of oral proceedings
26.06.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
CY03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
LU26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
PT03.02.2004
[2018/11]
Former [2010/20]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
CY03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
LU26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
PT03.02.2004
Former [2007/34]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
CY03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
LU26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
PT03.02.2004
IT26.01.2005
Former [2007/08]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
CY03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
LU26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
PT03.02.2004
Former [2005/23]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
LU26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
PT03.02.2004
Former [2005/03]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
IE26.01.2004
MC31.01.2004
PT03.02.2004
Former [2005/02]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
MC31.01.2004
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/41]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
DK03.12.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/31]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
PT03.02.2004
Former [2004/22]AT03.09.2003
CH03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
LI03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
Former [2004/16]AT03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
SE03.12.2003
Former [2004/14]AT03.09.2003
FI03.09.2003
GR03.12.2003
Former [2004/12]FI03.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0961909  (PIGNOLO NICOLA [IT]) [E] 1,4,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH09217944  ;
 [A]JPH05180458  ;
 [A]JPH10170018  ;
 [A]JPH0626664
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-10 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931108), vol. 017, no. 604, Database accession no. (M - 1506), [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940509), vol. 018, no. 239, Database accession no. (M - 1601), [A] * abstract *