Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038713

EP1038713 - Vehicle with a drive train for at least two driving wheels and with an internal combustion engine drive as well as with a fuel cell system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ballard Power Systems AG
Neue Strasse 95
73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE
[2002/24]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
XCELLSIS GmbH
Neue Strasse 95
73230 Kirchheim / Teck-Nabern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / zur Megede, Detlef
Allemannenstrasse 9
73230 Kirchheim/Teck / DE
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Kocher, Klaus-Peter , et al
Daimler AG Intellectual Property Management IPM, C 106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]Kocher, Klaus-Peter, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
c/o DaimlerChrysler AG Intellectual Property Management IPM, C 106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2000/39]Kocher, Klaus-Peter Dipl.-Phys , et al
DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Management, FTP/A-C106
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00101306.922.01.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateDE199911379426.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19913794
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1038713
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1038713
Date:27.12.2000
[2000/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038713
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60K6/00, B60K6/04
[2000/52]
Former International [2000/39]B60K6/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/37]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeug mit einem Antriebsstrang für wenigstens zwei Antriebsräder und mit einem Brennkraftmaschinen-Antrieb sowie mit einem Brennstoffzellensystem[2000/39]
English:Vehicle with a drive train for at least two driving wheels and with an internal combustion engine drive as well as with a fuel cell system[2000/39]
French:Véhicule avec une transmission pour au moins deux roues motrices et avec un moteur à combustion interne ainsi qu'un système de piles à combustible[2000/39]
Examination procedure05.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
26.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.05.2002Fee for grant paid
10.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9840922  (PROCYON POWER SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * page 8, line 3 - line 10 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 15 *;
 [AD]DE4412451  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [AD] 1,11 * column 2, line 22 - line 29 *;
 [AD]GB1447835  (NISSAN MOTOR) [AD] 1,11 * page 2, line 75 * * page 3, line 60 *