Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1083559

EP1083559 - A spindle motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2007
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINEBEA Co., Ltd.
4106-73, Miyota-machi
Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP
[2006/11]
Former [2001/11]For all designated states
MINEBEA CO., LTD.
4106-73, Miyota-machi
Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Obara, Rikuro, Minebea co., Ltd., Karuizawa Manuf.
4106-73 Miyota-machi
Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP
02 / Matsuura, Seiichi, Minebea co., Ltd., Karuizawa
4106-73 Miyota-machi
Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP
 [2001/11]
Representative(s)Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/11]Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG
Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date00101331.722.01.2000
[2001/11]
Priority number, dateJP1999024997503.09.1999         Original published format: JP 24997599
[2001/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1083559
Date:14.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1083559
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1083559
Date:15.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:G11B19/20, H02K5/173, F16C19/30
[2002/45]
Former International [2001/11]G11B19/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2003/30]
Former [2001/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Spindelmotor[2001/11]
English:A spindle motor[2001/11]
French:Moteur d'entrainement d'axe[2001/11]
Examination procedure12.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
24.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
20.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.2005Fee for grant paid
24.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
23.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH05176494  ;
 [A]US5639168  (NOGUCHI SHINGO [JP], et al);
 [A]US5138209  (CHUTA MASANOBU [JP], et al)
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931028), vol. 017, no. 593, Database accession no. (E - 1454), [X] 1-6 * abstract *