Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022520

EP1022520 - System for realizing the coupling of duct sections for air conditioning systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, FR
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Librizzi, Giuseppe
Via Italia 73
24068 Seriate (BG) / IT
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Librizzi, Giuseppe
Via Italia 73
24068 Seriate (BG) / IT
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Dini, Roberto , et al
Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 100
10060 None (TO) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Dini, Roberto , et al
Metroconsult S.r.l. Via Sestriere 10
10060 None (TO) / IT
Former [2004/03]Dini, Roberto, Dr. Ing. , et al
c/o Metroconsult S.r.l. Piazza Cavour 3
10060 None (Torino) / IT
Former [2000/30]Dini, Roberto, Dr. Ing.
Via Castagnole, 59
10060 None (Torino) / IT
Application number, filing date00101337.424.01.2000
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateIT1999TO00008U25.01.1999         Original published format: IT TO990008 U
[2000/30]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022520
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022520
Date:23.05.2001
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1022520
Date:23.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:F24F13/02, E04F17/04, F16L25/00
[2001/21]
Former International [2000/30]F24F13/02, E04F17/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
TitleGerman:System zur Kupplung von Kanalverbindungsstücken für Klimaanlagen[2000/30]
English:System for realizing the coupling of duct sections for air conditioning systems[2000/30]
French:Système pour l'accouplement des sections des conduites dans les systèmes de conditionnement d'air[2000/30]
Examination procedure07.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
01.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2004Fee for grant paid
14.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200203   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.2002
31.01.200304   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
CY23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
FR23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
SE23.06.2005
ES04.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
[2009/01]
Former [2008/07]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
SE23.06.2005
ES04.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/14]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
NL23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
GR23.06.2005
ES04.07.2005
PT07.09.2005
Former [2006/12]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
CH23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
LI23.03.2005
DK23.06.2005
Former [2005/51]AT23.03.2005
BE23.03.2005
FI23.03.2005
Former [2005/46]FI23.03.2005
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0318994  (BALF SNC DI GRIGGIO L [IT]) [X] 1,2,9,12,13,15-20,22,24,26-28,30 * abstract * * column 1, line 25 - line 44 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 6,8,10,11,14,21,23,25,29 [Y] 3-5,7;
 [Y]IT1242490  (LIBRIZZI GIUSEPPE) [Y] 3-5,7 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US5007222  (RAYMOND HARRY W [US]) [A] 6 * figure 8 *;
 [A]DE1459902  (BRUNOTTE KG H) [A] 7 * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0333463  (ARTWRIGHT IND SDN BHD [MY]);
 [A]US3640039  (MCKEE JAMES R, et al);
 [A]BE710746  (KLIRO-LUFTKANALBAU)