EP1026339 - Post [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pohatschka, Gerald Industriestrasse 27a 35580 Wetzlar / DE | [2000/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Missling, Arne Böck Tappe Kollegen Ludwigsplatz 9 35390 Giessen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Missling, Arne, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43 35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101483.6 | 26.01.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | DE1999201646U | 02.02.1999 Original published format: DE 29901646 U | [2000/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026339 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026339 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
E04F11/1834 (EP);
E04H17/20 (EP,US);
E04F11/1812 (EP);
E04F11/1817 (EP);
E04H17/1413 (EP);
E04H17/1448 (EP);
E04H17/1465 (EP);
E04H17/1482 (EP);
E04F2011/1819 (EP);
E04F2011/1821 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/29] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pfosten | [2000/32] | English: | Post | [2000/32] | French: | Poteau | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/09] | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.06.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0279202 (POPPE & POTTHOFF GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-5,10,13,14 * column 5, line 18 - column 8, line 36; figures 1-7 *[A] 6,7,11,12; | [XA]DE29509791U (STEUDEL JENS [DE]) [X] 1-5,8-14 * page 7, line 5 - page 10, line 4; figures 1-14 * [A] 6,7; | [XA]DE19520288 (POLENZ JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1-11,13,14 * column 5, line 10 - column 7, line 36; figures 1-14 * [A] 12 |