Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038493

EP1038493 - Universal mat with removable strips [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2006  [2006/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R & L Marketing, Inc.
1110 Thalia Avenue Youngstown
Ohio 45501 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
R & L Marketing, Inc.
1110 Thalia Avenue
Youngstown, Ohio 45501 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ullmann, Myron
1110 Thalia Avenue
Youngstown, Ohio 45501 / US
02 / Burman, Robert M.
1110 Thalia Avenue
Youngstown, Ohio 45501 / US
03 / Kessler, Ronald M.
1110 Thalia Avenue
Youngstown, Ohio 45501 / US
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Rau, Manfred , et al
Rau, Schneck & Hübner
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Königstrasse 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date00101487.726.01.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateUS1999027436023.03.1999         Original published format: US 274360
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1038493
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1038493
Date:26.06.2002
[2002/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:A47L23/26
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:Universelle Fussmatte mit abnehmbaren Streifen[2000/39]
English:Universal mat with removable strips[2000/39]
French:Pallaisson universel à bandes détachables[2000/39]
Examination procedure13.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/07]
28.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/49]
17.07.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9636268  (SUTHERLAND THOMAS LANGLEY [GB], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 5, line 9 - page 5, line 19 * [Y] 2;
 [Y]EP0359478  (KIMBERLY CLARK LTD [GB]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 39 - column 2, line 50 *;
 [X]EP0059886  (ARENS ERICH) [X] 1,3,4,6 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 22; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0676169  (ARENS ERICH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 53 *;
 [X]US4796399  (KESSLER RONALD N [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * column 2, line 45 - column 2, line 53 *;
 [A]DE4407231  (GEGGUS EMS GMBH [DE]);
 [A]EP0365869  (SPECIALTIES CONST [US]);
 [A]EP0289880  (ARENS ERICH)
by applicantUS3703059
 US4796399