blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0998012 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0998012



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 77
26.01.2004 Closing of application Search / examination 1
07.01.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
14.10.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
09.07.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
25.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.02.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.02.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.02.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.05.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.03.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
03.03.2000 Invitation to pay designation fees with additional fee Search / examination 1
28.01.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.01.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
28.01.2000 Description Search / examination 8
28.01.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2000 Drawings Search / examination 4
28.01.2000 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
28.01.2000 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 32
28.01.2000 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 7