blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0998012


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.01.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.03.2004  [2004/12]
30.12.2003 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
10.10.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.07.2003 New entry: Examination report or reply
21.02.2003 Examination report or reply
21.02.2003 First examination report
07.11.2002 Renewal fee
08.11.2001 Renewal fee
07.12.2000 Renewal fee
01.12.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  17.01.2001 [2001/03]
21.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  06.12.2000 [2000/49]
03.04.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
17.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.05.2000 [2000/18]
01.03.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
29.02.2000 Renewal fee