Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998012

EP0998012 - Integral bearing type electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.03.2004  [2004/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINEBEA KABUSHIKI-KAISHA
73-4106 Miyota Oaza, Miyota-cho Kitasaku-gun
Nagano-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
MINEBEA KABUSHIKI-KAISHA
73-4106 Miyota Oaza, Miyota-cho
Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Obara, Rikuro
Minebea K.K., 73-4106 Miyota Oaza, Miyota-cho
Kitasaku-gun, Nagano-ken / JP
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron & Warren, 18 South End
Kensington, London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date00101617.909.11.1993
[2000/18]
Priority number, dateJP1992032364509.11.1992         Original published format: JP 32364592
[2000/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998012
Date:03.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H02K7/08, H02K5/173
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/18]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Motor des Typs mit intergriertem Lager[2000/18]
English:Integral bearing type electric motor[2000/18]
French:Moteur électrique du type à palier intégré[2000/18]
Examination procedure06.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
25.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/12]
14.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/12]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP93308952.6  / EP0597678
EP97201208.2  / EP0790694
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
24.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 08
26.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 09
29.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.03.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   24.03.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200311   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0592214  (MINEBEA KK [JP]) [E] 1-3 * column 3, line 15 - line 22; figures 2,10 *;
 [Y]DE3540363  (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [Y]JPH03285546  ;
 [A]FR2565017  (MUELLER GEORG NUERNBERG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 14 - line 19; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4733120  (KAWABE EIJI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 1 - line 13; figure 1 *;
 [PA]WO9306600  (INTEGRAL PERIPHERALS INC [US]) [PA] 1-3 * figures 1,10 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920324), vol. 16, no. 116, Database accession no. (E - 1181), & JP03285546 A 19911216 (NIPPON DENSAN CORP) [Y] 1-3 * abstract *