Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028072

EP1028072 - Laoding and compacting device for the collecting container of a refuse collecting vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haller Umweltsysteme GmbH & Co.
Rigistrasse 1-3
12277 Berlin / DE
[2000/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Eckhard, Silvan
Kurparkallee 4
15834 Rangsdorf / DE
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Rupprecht, Kay , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Rupprecht, Kay, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date00101716.927.01.2000
[2000/33]
Priority number, dateDE199910598612.02.1999         Original published format: DE 19905986
[2000/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1028072
Date:16.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1028072
Date:19.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP06.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65F3/20
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:Belade- und Verdichtungseinrichtung für den Sammelbehälter eines Abfallsammelfahrzeugs[2000/33]
English:Laoding and compacting device for the collecting container of a refuse collecting vehicle[2000/33]
French:Dispositif de chargement et de compactage pour le récipient d'un véhicule de ramassage d'ordures[2000/33]
Examination procedure20.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
26.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2004Fee for grant paid
16.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
IT19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
PT19.10.2004
CY27.01.2005
LU27.01.2005
AT31.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/40]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
IT19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
CY27.01.2005
LU27.01.2005
AT31.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2007/35]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
IT19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
CY27.01.2005
LU27.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2007/20]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
CY27.01.2005
LU27.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2007/08]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
LU27.01.2005
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/14]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
BE31.01.2005
CH31.01.2005
LI31.01.2005
MC31.01.2005
Former [2006/13]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
NL19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
BE31.01.2005
Former [2005/19]FI19.05.2004
IE19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
Former [2005/18]FI19.05.2004
DK19.08.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
Former [2005/06]FI19.05.2004
GR19.08.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
Former [2005/02]FI19.05.2004
SE19.08.2004
ES30.08.2004
Former [2004/52]SE19.08.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]WO8606351  (GEN SAMAT SA [SM]) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 20 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [DA]EP0691289  (ECOLOGY SYSTEM INTERNATIONAL S [IT]) [DA] 1-8 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 23; figures 1-3 *;
 [DA]DE2444771  (HALLER GMBH FAHRZEUGBAU) [DA] 1-3,5-8 * page 9, line 11 - page 14, line 15 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]US3746192  (HERPICH W, et al) [DA] 1-5,7,8 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 54; figures 3-5 *
by applicantEP0149436
 EP0691289
 US3746192
 DE2422771