Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002673

EP1002673 - Trailer coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  16.01.2009
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2009Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 18.02.2009  [2009/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCAMBIA Industrial Developments Aktiengesellschaft
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
SCAMBIA INDUSTRIAL DEVELOPMENTS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
In der Ballota 2a
9494 Schaan / LI
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
ORIS FAHRZEUGTEILE HANS RIEHLE GmbH
Im Bornrain 2
71616 Möglingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gentner, Wolfgang
Karlstrasse 28
71254 Ditzingen-Heimerdingen / DE
02 / Kleb, Emmerich
Am Feldle 17
71606 Markgröningen / DE
03 / Riehle, Jörg
Krabbenbäumle 11
70439 Stuttgart / DE
04 / Riehle, Hans
Salonallee 17
71638 Ludwigsburg / DE
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date00101823.321.03.1997
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateDE199611295901.04.1996         Original published format: DE 19612959
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1002673
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1002673
Date:02.08.2000
[2000/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002673
Date:04.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/23]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1002673
Date:18.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60D1/54, B60D1/52
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:Anhängekupplung[2000/21]
English:Trailer coupling[2000/21]
French:Attelage de remorque[2000/21]
Examination procedure31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
30.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2003Fee for grant paid
11.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97104849.1  / EP0799732
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.03.2004  07.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Jaeger Cartronix GmbH
Stra heimer Stra e 10
61169 Friedberg / DE
Opponent's representative
Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Friedrichstraße 2-6
60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  04.03.2004  07.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Westfalia-Automotive GmbH & Co. KG
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda- Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/31]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2004  07.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Jaeger Cartronix GmbH
Stra heimer Stra e 10
61169 Friedberg / DE
Opponent's representative
KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte
Cronstettenstrasse 66
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  04.03.2004  07.04.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Westfalia-Automotive GmbH & Co. KG
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda- Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Former [2004/19]
Opponent(s)01  03.03.2004   
Jaeger Cartronix GmbH
Stra heimer Stra e 10
61169 Friedberg / DE
Opponent's representative
KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN
Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 02  04.03.2004   
Westfalia-Automotive GmbH
Am Sandberg 45
33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE
Opponent's representative
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen
Gadderbaumer Strasse 14
33602 Bielefeld / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
15.04.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.11.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.02.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
18.04.2008Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.04.2008Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.09.2008Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
20.12.2008Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.04.2006Appeal received No.  T0503/06
12.06.2006Statement of grounds filed
18.04.2008Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
18.04.2008Date of oral proceedings
25.04.2008Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT04.06.2003
DK04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
AT21.03.2004
LU21.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GB21.03.2005
[2007/35]
Former [2006/13]DK04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
AT21.03.2004
LU21.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GB21.03.2005
Former [2005/51]DK04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
AT21.03.2004
LU21.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
Former [2005/23]DK04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
LU21.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
Former [2005/21]DK04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
Former [2005/14]DK04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
BE31.03.2004
Former [2004/29]DK04.09.2003
PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/10]PT04.09.2003
SE04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/03]PT04.09.2003
ES15.09.2003
Former [2004/02]PT04.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3442514  (SMAT FAHRZEUGTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-11 *;
 [A]US4744583  (BLACKWOOD LLOYD [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-7 *;
 [PA]WO9710111  (ZIJLSTRA BEREND [DE], et al) [PA] 1 * figures 1-10 *;
 [A]WO9115374  (JSM KONSULT HB [SE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 *;
 [DA]DE2619913  (VOLVO AB) [DA] 1 * figures 1,2 *
OppositionUS4693488
 DE2902683
 DE3532102
 DE2610558
 DE2835920
 DE3150620
 EP0147549