Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034973

EP1034973 - Vertically adjustable vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.04.2006  [2006/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmidt, Bernd
Hohnerstrasse 17
72218 Wildberg / DE
02 / Schrom, Ralf-Henning
Kelterstrasse 13
72108 Rottenburg / DE
03 / Schulz, Volkmar
Schlagleite 8 a
96479 Weitransdorf / DE
04 / Shephard, Philip C.
38 Stonor Road
Birmingham B28 0QR / GB
[2000/37]
Application number, filing date00101827.429.01.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateDE199911008108.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19910081
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1034973
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1034973
Date:13.11.2002
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/16, B60N2/02
[2002/45]
Former International [2000/37]B60N2/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2003/31]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Höhenverstellbarer Fahrzeugsitz[2000/37]
English:Vertically adjustable vehicle seat[2000/37]
French:Siège de véhicule réglable en hauteur[2000/37]
Examination procedure15.10.2002Examination requested  [2002/50]
30.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
19.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4437539  (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB [DE]) [X] 1-3,8 * column 4, line 43 - column 6, line 28; figures 1,3 * [A] 4,9;
 [X]FR2585641  (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 35; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [DA]DE4224458  (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE4224458