Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046439

EP1046439 - Roll for a radial thread rolling head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fette GmbH
Grabauer Strasse 24
21493 Schwarzenbek / DE
[2002/34]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
Wilhelm Fette GmbH
Grabauer Strasse 24
21493 Schwarzenbek / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Focken, Andreas
Emil-Nolde-Weg 24
21493 Schwarzenbeck / DE
02 / Oppelt, Klaus
Röhrenkamp 32
21481 Lauenburg / DE
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/43]Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons
Neuer Wall 41
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date00101837.329.01.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateDE1999207128U22.04.1999         Original published format: DE 29907128 U
[2000/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1046439
Date:25.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1046439
Date:26.06.2002
[2002/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046439
Date:10.12.2003
Language:DE
[2003/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:B21H3/04
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2003/12]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Rolle für einen Radialgewinderollkopf[2000/43]
English:Roll for a radial thread rolling head[2000/43]
French:Rouleau pour tête radiale à rouler des filets[2000/43]
Examination procedure04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
30.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2002Fee for grant paid
15.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.12.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.05.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
Opposition(s)13.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.02.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.02.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2335651  (FETTE WILHELM GMBH) [A] 1 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 19; figures 6,7; claim 13 *;
 [A]US3803691  (GEESE K, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 34 - line 39; figure 6 *;
 [A]DE837088  (PEE WEE MASCHINEN UND APPBAU W) [A] 1,2,4 * page 2, line 78 - line 87; figure 5 *;
 [DA]DE3930131  (FETTE WILHELM GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 1 *