blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1028105

EP1028105 - Process for the preparation of Cyanoacetic esters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2005
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lonza AG
Münchensteinerstrasse 38
4052 Basel / CH
[2000/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Hanselmann, Paul Dr.
Holzachra 25
3902 Brig-Glis / CH
02 / Hildbrand, Stefan Dr.
Bäretstrasse 8a
3930 Visp / CH
[2000/33]
Application number, filing date00102087.403.02.2000
[2000/33]
Priority number, dateEP1999010228609.02.1999         Original published format: EP 99102286
[2000/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1028105
Date:16.08.2000
Language:DE
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1028105
Date:21.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.06.2000
ClassificationIPC:C07C253/30, C07C255/19
[2000/33]
CPC:
C07C253/30 (EP); C07C51/02 (KR)
C-Set:
C07C253/30, C07C255/19 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cyanessigsäureestern[2000/33]
English:Process for the preparation of Cyanoacetic esters[2000/33]
French:Procédé pour la préparation d'ester de l'acide cyanoacétique[2000/33]
Examination procedure22.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
07.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2004Fee for grant paid
26.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI21.04.2004
NL21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
[2013/51]
Former [2006/13]FI21.04.2004
NL21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/18]FI21.04.2004
DK21.07.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/06]FI21.04.2004
GR21.07.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2005/02]FI21.04.2004
SE21.07.2004
Former [2004/52]SE21.07.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US4174347  (AUSTERMUHLE-BERTOLA HELENA [NL]) [X] 1-7 * example - *;
 [X]  - LHOMMET, GERARD ET AL, "Preparation of benzyl esters by phase transfer catalysis", C. R. SEANCES ACAD. SCI., SER. C (1980), 290(23), 445-7, XP000907001 [X] 1-7 * page 446; table . * * page 446, paragraph 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.