Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034753

EP1034753 - Annuloplasty ring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maquet Cardiopulmonary AG
Hechinger Strasse 38
72145 Hirrlingen / DE
[2004/50]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Jostra AG
Hechinger Strasse 38
72145 Hirrlingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Prof. Dr. med. Maazouzi Wajih
Route des Zaers 6-7
Villa 119 Rabat / MA
02 / Dr. Ing. Ralf Kaufmann
Ringstrasse 13
72414 Rangendingen / DE
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Möbus, Daniela , et al
Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85
72764 Reutlingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwältin Dr. Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85
72764 Reutlingen / DE
Former [2000/37]Möbus, Daniela, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Möbus, Dr.-Ing. Daniela Möbus, Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Schwan, Hindenburgstrasse 65
72762 Reutlingen / DE
Application number, filing date00102099.903.02.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateDE199911023309.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19910233
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034753
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034753
Date:16.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2005/03]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anuloplastiering[2000/37]
English:Annuloplasty ring[2000/37]
French:Anneau pour annuloplastie[2000/37]
Examination procedure07.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
02.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2004Fee for grant paid
01.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.02.2005
FR16.02.2005
GB16.02.2005
IE16.02.2005
IT16.02.2005
NL16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
GR16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
PT18.07.2005
[2007/35]
Former [2006/31]FI16.02.2005
FR16.02.2005
GB16.02.2005
IE16.02.2005
NL16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
GR16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
PT18.07.2005
Former [2006/14]FI16.02.2005
GB16.02.2005
IE16.02.2005
NL16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
GR16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
PT18.07.2005
Former [2006/13]FI16.02.2005
GB16.02.2005
IE16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
Former [2006/12]FI16.02.2005
GB16.02.2005
DK16.05.2005
SE16.05.2005
ES27.05.2005
Former [2005/48]FI16.02.2005
SE16.05.2005
Former [2005/46]FI16.02.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9503757  (SEGUIN JACQUES [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,10-12 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0595791  (BAXTER INT [US]) [X] 1-4,10-12 * the whole document *