Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1027978

EP1027978 - Optical disk and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murata, Shozo
5-42-31-201, Asahi-cho
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Tajima, Yukitoshi
5-2095-5-202, Iriya
Zama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/33]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date00102161.708.02.2000
[2000/33]
Priority number, dateJP1999003172309.02.1999         Original published format: JP 3172399
JP1999019042305.07.1999         Original published format: JP 19042399
JP1999025980614.09.1999         Original published format: JP 25980699
JP1999029852620.10.1999         Original published format: JP 29852699
JP1999029873820.10.1999         Original published format: JP 29873899
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1027978
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1027978
Date:27.09.2000
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1027978
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C45/26, G11B7/26, G11B7/007
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/24]
Former [2000/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optische Platte und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[2000/33]
English:Optical disk and method of producing the same[2000/33]
French:Disque optique et son procédé de fabrication[2000/33]
Examination procedure08.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
14.11.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
10.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.01.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
28.03.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
31.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2002Fee for grant paid
23.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02004231.3  / EP1211040
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.05.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPS6371325  ;
 [X]JPS62180541  ;
 [X]JPH10149587  ;
 [PX]WO9956935  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [PX] 1,3-9,11,18-24,26,34-39,41,57,59,61,64-68,70,74-76 * the whole document *;
 [DY]EP0640458  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DY] 3,4,6,8,9,11,18,19,21,23,24,26,33,34,36,38,39,41,64,65,67,68,70 * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 22; figure - *;
 [Y]JPH117663  ;
 [Y]JPH0330134  ;
 [Y]JPH01246391  ;
 [Y]JPH05298752
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880811), vol. 12, no. 294, Database accession no. (M - 730), [X] 1,3,4,18,19,33,34,57,59,61,64,65,74-76 * abstract * [Y] 3,4,6,8,9,11,15,18,19,21,23,24,26,30,33,34,36,38,39,41,45,51,58,60,64,65,67,68,70
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880128), vol. 12, no. 29, Database accession no. (P - 660), [X] 1,2,57,59,61,63,74-76 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, [X] 1,8-10,57,59,61,67-69,74-76 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 4, [Y] 15,30,45,51 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910423), vol. 15, no. 162, Database accession no. (P - 1194), [Y] 15,30,45,51 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891225), vol. 13, no. 589, Database accession no. (C - 670), [Y] 15,30,45,51 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940218), vol. 18, no. 103, Database accession no. (P - 1696), [Y] 58,60 * abstract *