Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1029969

EP1029969 - Folding ironing board [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/34]Improved folding ironing board
[2003/36]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Costruzioni O.M.P. Di Pecorari Martino
Via Del Lavoro, 279
40014 Crevalcore (Bologna) / IT
[2000/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Pecorari, Martino
Via Di Mezzo Ponente, 1182
40014 Crevalcore (Prov. of Bologna) / IT
[2000/34]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano Gardi Patents, Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/34]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano Gardi Patents, Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date00102248.214.02.2000
[2000/34]
Priority number, dateIT1999MO0000718.02.1999         Original published format: IT MO990007
[2000/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1029969
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1029969
Date:11.10.2000
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1029969
Date:28.04.2004
Language:EN
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:D06F81/02, D06F81/04
[2000/41]
Former International [2000/34]D06F81/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/34]
TitleGerman:Ausklappbarer Bügeltisch[2000/34]
English:Folding ironing board[2003/36]
French:Planche à repasser pliable[2000/34]
Former [2000/34]Improved folding ironing board
Examination procedure26.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/17]
10.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.2003Fee for grant paid
30.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.04.2004
BE28.04.2004
CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
DK28.07.2004
GR28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
ES08.08.2004
PT28.09.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2006/13]AT28.04.2004
BE28.04.2004
CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
NL28.04.2004
DK28.07.2004
GR28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
ES08.08.2004
Former [2005/18]AT28.04.2004
BE28.04.2004
CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
DK28.07.2004
GR28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
ES08.08.2004
Former [2005/14]AT28.04.2004
BE28.04.2004
CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
ES08.08.2004
Former [2005/11]AT28.04.2004
CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
ES08.08.2004
Former [2005/06]CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
GR28.07.2004
SE28.07.2004
ES08.08.2004
Former [2005/02]CH28.04.2004
FI28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
SE28.07.2004
ES08.08.2004
Former [2004/52]CH28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
SE28.07.2004
Former [2004/51]CH28.04.2004
LI28.04.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0686722  (NUOVA ROSSI S R L [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2683944  (RIPLEY KIEL JOHN) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2721407  (SUTHERLAND HAZEL E) [A] 1 * the whole document *