Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022274

EP1022274 - Intermediates for the preparation of Oxazolidinedione and Thiazolidinedione derivatves [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/30]Oxazolidinedione and Thiazolidinedione derivatves, their preparation and their use
[2001/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES, MC
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sankyo Company Limited
5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho 3-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8426 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
Sankyo Company Limited
5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho 3-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8426 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takashi, Fujita, C/O Sankyo Co., Ltd.
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140 / JP
02 / Koichi, Fujimoto
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140 / JP
03 / Takao, Yoshioka
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140 / JP
04 / Hiroaki, Yanagisawa
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140 / JP
05 / Toshihiko, Fujiwara
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140 / JP
06 / Hiroyoshi, Horikoshi
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140 / JP
07 / Minoru, Oguchi
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140 / JP
08 / Kunio, Wada
2-58, Hiromachi 1-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140 / JP
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Gibson, Christian John Robert
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Gibson, Christian John Robert
MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date00102313.411.04.1995
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateJP1994007208311.04.1994         Original published format: JP 7208394
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1022274
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1022274
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D263/44, C07D277/34
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
TitleGerman:Zwischenprodukte zur Hertellung von Oxazolidindion- und Thiazolidindionderivate[2001/32]
English:Intermediates for the preparation of Oxazolidinedione and Thiazolidinedione derivatves[2001/32]
French:Composeés intermediares pour la préparation de dérivés d' oxazolidinedione et de thiazolidinedione[2001/32]
Former [2000/30]Oxazolidindion- und Thiazolidindionderivate, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung
Former [2000/30]Oxazolidinedione and Thiazolidinedione derivatves, their preparation and their use
Former [2000/30]Dérivés d' oxazolidinedione et de thiazolidinedione leur préparation et leur Utilisation
Examination procedure28.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
12.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2002Fee for grant paid
12.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95302409.8  / EP0676398
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.04.2003
GB11.04.2003
IE11.04.2003
LU11.04.2003
ES12.04.2003
SE12.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
MC30.04.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/43]AT11.04.2003
GB11.04.2003
IE11.04.2003
LU11.04.2003
SE12.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/39]GB11.04.2003
IE11.04.2003
LU11.04.2003
SE12.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/29]GB11.04.2003
IE11.04.2003
SE12.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/28]GB11.04.2003
SE12.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/22]GB11.04.2003
SE12.04.2003
CH30.04.2003
LI30.04.2003
Former [2004/16]SE12.04.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0543662  (SANKYO CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 24 - page 25; figures VI,VIII *;
 [A]WO9218501  (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 13; figures I-5 *;
 [A]EP0590793  (SANKYO CO [JP]) [A] 1 * page 19; figure III *;
 [A]EP0208420  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4; figure IV *;
 [A]  TAKASHI SOHDA ET AL., "Studies on antidiabetic Agents III.", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., japan, (1982), vol. 30, no. 10, pages 3601 - 3616, XP002024094 [A] 1 * page 3607; examples 39,40 *