Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004562

EP1004562 - Process for preparing olefins from compounds containing oxygen [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.11.2001 [2001/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc.
13501 Katy Freeway
Houston, TX 77079 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]For all designated states
ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc.
13501 Katy Freeway
Houston, TX 77079 / US
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Exxon Chemical Patents, Inc.
13501 Katy Freeway
Houston, Texas 77079 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sun, Hsian-ning
4212 Villanova
Houston, Texas 77005 / US
02 / Vaughn, Stehpen Neil
1111 Southern Hills
Kingwood, Texas 77339 / US
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Mareschal, Anne , et al
ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc.
IP Law Europe
Hermeslaan 2
1831 Machelen / BE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Mareschal, Anne , et al
Exxon Chemical Europe Inc., Law Technology, P.O. Box 105
1831 Machelen / BE
Application number, filing date00102345.613.12.1996
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateUS1995057150613.12.1995         Original published format: US 571506
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1004562
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07C11/02, C07C1/20, B01J29/85
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Olefinen aus sauerstoffenthaltenden Verbindungen[2000/22]
English:Process for preparing olefins from compounds containing oxygen[2000/22]
French:Procédé pour la préparation d'oléfines à partir de composés contenant de l'oxygène[2000/22]
Examination procedure03.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
12.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/45]
01.06.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/45]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96943680.7  / EP0876313
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0105591  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]);
 [A]US4698452  (LE VAN MAO RAYMOND [CA], et al);
 [A]US5147627  (CHANG CLARENCE D [US], et al) [A] 28 * claim - *;
 [A]WO8603771  (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 28 * claim - *
 [AD]  - T. INUI, "Structure-Reactivity Relationship in Methanol to Olefin conversion on Various Microporous Crystalline Catalysts", HETEROGENEOUS CATALYSIS, AMSTERDAM, (1991), vol. 67, pages 233 - 242, XP000617806 [AD] 1-27 * page 241 - page 242 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-2991(08)61942-4