EP1026813 - Winders for electric motor armatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIS S.p.A. 50028 Tavarnelle Val di Pesa (Firenze) / IT | [2000/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stratico, Glanfranco Via Antonio Lombardi, 32 53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
Ciarlitto, Pasquale Via Roma, 268/B 50028 Tavarnelle Val di Pesa (Firenze) / IT | 03 /
Mazzoni, Gianni Via G. Pieraccini, 7 53036 Poggibonsi (Siena) / IT | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | Lotti, Giorgio, et al c/o Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00102346.4 | 03.02.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | US19990118728P | 04.02.1999 Original published format: US 118728 P | US20000495832 | 01.02.2000 Original published format: US 495832 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026813 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026813 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/00, H02K15/09, H02K15/085, H02K15/095 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
H02K15/09 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49071 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/32] | H02K15/00, H02K15/09 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/06] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wickelmaschine für die Ankerwicklung von Elektromotoren | [2000/32] | English: | Winders for electric motor armatures | [2000/32] | French: | Machine pour enrouler le bobinage d'induit d'un moteur électrique | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/35] | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.12.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5494230 (DOLGAS PATRICK A [US]) [X] 1,10,14,20-22,2-9,11-13,15-19 * column 3, lines 3-7,27; figure 1 * * column 4, line 1 * * column 6, lines 19-22; figure 3 * * column 4, line 37 * * column 3, lines 60-67 * * column 6, lines 22-28; figure 2 * * column 2, lines 3-7 * * column 8, lines 12-44 * * column 5, lines 55-62 * * column 7, lines 44-56; figures 1,2 * * column 6, lines 3-15; figure 2 * * column 7, lines 38-43 * * column 2, lines 3-9; figures 1,2 * * column 9, lines 10-67 * * column 10, lines 1-25 *; | [Y]US4289281 (GEORGE ROBERT D, et al) [Y] 1-19 * column 1, lines 5-18,42-46; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 1,2,35-64 * * column 3, lines 36-45 * * column 4, lines 39-43 *; | [Y]US5060780 (SANTANDREA LUCIANO [IT], et al) [Y] 1-19 * column 21, lines 42-58; figures 1,6,12,14,17,21,24 * * column 23, lines 37-68 * * column 24, lines 1-3 *; | [A]US4633577 (BANNER ALVIN C [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 9, lines 1-20; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4029981 (G RUOSS SPEZIALMASCHINEN FUER [DE]) [A] 1-20 * column 3, lines 35-39; figures 1,2 * * column 12, lines 44-66 * |