Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050995

EP1050995 - Control commands for displaying images in a local ring network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/45]Local ring network
[2004/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.07.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH
Becker-Göring-Strasse 16
76307 Karlsbad / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/36]For all designated states
Harman Becker Automotive Systems GmbH
Becker-Goering-Strasse 16
76307 Karlsbad / DE
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
BECKER GmbH
Im Stöckmädle 1
D-76307 Karlsbad / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stiegler, Andreas
Epernayerstrasse 34
76275 Ettlingen / DE
02 / Becker, Michael
Kronenwerkstrasse 20
76661 Philippsburg / DE
03 / Schöpp, Harald
Erlenweg 30
76275 Ettlingen / DE
04 / Klaus-Wagenbrenner, Jochen
Am Bergwald 3
76571 Oberweier / DE
05 / Wietzke, Joachim
Beim Wasserturm 6a
76288 Karlsruhe / DE
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Waldstrasse 33
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date00102485.005.02.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateDE199910808225.02.1999         Original published format: DE 19908082
[2000/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1050995
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1050995
Date:02.04.2003
[2003/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050995
Date:01.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, H04L12/423
[2004/14]
Former International [2000/45]H04L12/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:Steuerbefehl zur Anzeige von Bildern in lokalem, ringförmigen Netzwerk[2004/14]
English:Control commands for displaying images in a local ring network[2004/14]
French:Données de commande pour l'affichage d'images dans un réseau local en anneau[2004/14]
Former [2000/45]Lokales ringförmiges Netzwerk
Former [2000/45]Local ring network
Former [2000/45]Réseau local en anneau
Examination procedure26.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/27]
28.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2004Fee for grant paid
16.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI01.09.2004
IE01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
PT01.02.2005
AT05.02.2005
CY05.02.2005
LU05.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/20]FI01.09.2004
IE01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
AT05.02.2005
CY05.02.2005
LU05.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2007/08]FI01.09.2004
IE01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
AT05.02.2005
LU05.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/34]FI01.09.2004
IE01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
AT05.02.2005
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/14]FI01.09.2004
IE01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
BE28.02.2005
CH28.02.2005
LI28.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/13]FI01.09.2004
IE01.09.2004
NL01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
BE28.02.2005
Former [2005/46]FI01.09.2004
IE01.09.2004
DK01.12.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
Former [2005/27]FI01.09.2004
IE01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
ES12.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI01.09.2004
IE01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI01.09.2004
GR01.12.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI01.09.2004
SE01.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE01.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0855311  (BECKER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 5, paragraphs 1,2 * * column 8, line 51 - column 9, line 12; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE19653438  (MITSUBISHI ELEC SEMICONDUCTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 2 - line 3 * * column 7, line 17 - line 33; figure 1 * * column 8, paragraph 2 * * column 11, paragraph 2; figure 6 *;
 [DA]DE19503212  (BECKER GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * column 2, line 17 - line 21 * * column 4, line 20 - line 23 * * figure 3 *