Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028227

EP1028227 - Method and apparatus for optimizing production from gas lift well [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intevep SA
Apartado 76343
Caracas 1070 A / VE
[2000/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Garcia, Gonzalo
Urb. Agua Moel Country, 13, La Mora II
Edo. Argua / VE
02 / Ranson, Aaron
Resd. Las Churuatas, T2-Apt. 123
San Antonio / VE
[2000/33]
Representative(s)Hiebsch, Gerhard F. , et al
Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG)
78224 Singen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Hiebsch, Gerhard F. , et al
Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464
78204 Singen / DE
Former [2000/33]Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. G.F. Hiebsch, Dipl.-Ing. N. Behrmann M.B.A. (NY), Heinrich-Weber-Platz 1
78224 Singen / DE
Application number, filing date00102689.709.02.2000
[2000/33]
Priority number, dateUS1999024837410.02.1999         Original published format: US 248374
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1028227
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1028227
Date:04.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:E21B43/12
[2000/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/18]
Former [2000/33]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Optimierung der Produktion von Gasliftbohrungen[2000/33]
English:Method and apparatus for optimizing production from gas lift well[2000/33]
French:Procédé et appareil pour optimiser la production d'un puits avec ascension au gaz[2000/33]
Examination procedure26.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
17.02.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
06.06.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
01.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2005Fee for grant paid
03.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
23.03.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
23.03.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4267885  (SANDERFORD DORSEY W) [DA] 1-6,10-12 * figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5107441  (DECKER KENNETH L [US]) [A] 1,10,12 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4442710  (MENG HAI-ZUI [US]) [A] 1,10,12 * page 1 *;
 [A]US5172717  (BOYLE WILLIAM G [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0756065  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [A]US4787450  (ANDERSEN GREGORY R [US], et al) [A] 1,10,12 * column 8 - column 11 *;
 [A]US4738313  (MCKEE FOUNT E [US]);
 [PA]US5871048  (TOKAR TIMOTHY J [US], et al)
by applicantUS4267885