Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1038817

EP1038817 - Method and device for leading a web onto a roller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2006
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2007  [2007/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Str. 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2000/51]For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Madrzak, Zygmunt
Ellwanger Strasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
02 / Wohlfahrt, Matthias
Teutonenweg 55
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2000/39]
Application number, filing date00102939.614.02.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateDE199911321924.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19913219
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1038817
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1038817
Date:21.08.2002
[2002/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1038817
Date:01.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65H19/28
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   SE [2003/20]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufführen einer Materialbahn auf einen Tambour[2000/39]
English:Method and device for leading a web onto a roller[2000/39]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour guider une bande de matériau sur un tambour[2000/39]
Examination procedure21.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/17]
17.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2005Fee for grant paid
29.11.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0997415  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [E] 19,41,44 * column 1, line 19 - line 39 * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 11 * * column 3, line 2 - line 14 * * column 3, line 28 - line 33 * * column 5, line 18 - line 43 * * column 7, line 15 - line 21 * * claims 2-11,17,18 * * figure - *;
 [E]EP0997416  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [E] 19 * column 1, line 23 - line 32 * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 2 * * column 4, line 47 - line 52 * * column 5, line 12 - line 54 * * claims 1-4,11,18 * * figure - *;
 [XA]WO9637429  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 19,21,22 * page 4, line 6 - page 6, line 18 * * page 11, line 16 - line 18 * * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 1;
 [A]EP0664267  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 20 * column 3, line 39 - line 43 *