Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009188

EP1009188 - Data transmitting apparatus, data receiving apparatus and data transmission control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.2008
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/33]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takeda, Hidetoshi
5-19-12-103, Deguchi, Hirakata-shi
Osaka 573-0065 / JP
02 / Iitsuka, Hiroyuki
6-25-6, Kisaichi, Katano-shi
Osaka 576-0033 / JP
03 / Nishimura, Takuya
3-9-18F, Matsuzaki-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-0053 / JP
04 / Yamada, Masazumi
6-24-10, Kinda-cho
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka, 570 / JP
[2000/42]
Former [2000/35]01 / Takeda, Hidetoshi
22-7, Kourinishino-cho
Neyajawa-shi, Osaka 572 / JP
02 / Iitsuka, Hiroyuki
5-9-5-305, Kouzu
Katano-shi, Osaka, 576 / JP
03 / Nishimura, Takuya
3-9-18F, Matsuzaki-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-0053 / JP
04 / Yamada, Masazumi
6-24-10, Kinda-cho
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka, 570 / JP
Former [2000/24]01 / Takeda, Hidetoshi
22-7, Kourinishino-cho
Neyajawa-shi, Osaka 572 / JP
02 / Iitsuka, Hiroyuki
5-9-5-305, Kouzu
Katano-shi, Osaka, 576 / JP
03 / Nishimura, Takuya
6-1-105, Myokenzaka
Katano-shi, Osaka, 571 / JP
04 / Yamada, Masazumi
6-24-10, Kinda-cho
Moriguchi-shi, Osaka, 570 / JP
Representative(s)Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25
1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH
Former [2000/24]Balsters, Robert , et al
Novapat International SA, 9, rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date00103028.725.04.1996
[2000/24]
Priority number, dateJP1995010555428.04.1995         Original published format: JP 10555495
JP1995014720914.06.1995         Original published format: JP 14720995
JP1995019634501.08.1995         Original published format: JP 19634595
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1009188
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1009188
Date:27.08.2003
[2003/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009188
Date:15.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04L12/64
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/21]
Former [2000/24]AT,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
TitleGerman:Datenübertragungsvorrichtung, Datenempfangsgerät und Steuerungsvorrichtung für die Datenübertragung[2000/24]
English:Data transmitting apparatus, data receiving apparatus and data transmission control apparatus[2000/24]
French:Dispositif de transmission de données, dispositif de reception de données et dispositif de contrôle de la transmission de données[2000/24]
Examination procedure03.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
11.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2007Fee for grant paid
04.06.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96912231.6  / EP0862295
Opposition(s)16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
20.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
19.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
28.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
27.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
07.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
06.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
26.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES26.11.2007
IT30.04.2008
[2011/12]
Former [2008/08]ES26.11.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0413488  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 16 *;
 [A]EP0632671  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 10 - line 25 *