Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035059

EP1035059 - Device for optical yarn monitoring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  26.05.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2006Opposition rejectedpublished on 28.06.2006  [2006/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saurer GmbH & Co. KG
Landgrafenstrasse 45
41069 Mönchengladbach / DE
[2003/42]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO.
Blumenberger Strasse 143-145
D-41061 Mönchengladbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Henze, Herbert
Annakirchstrasse 234
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
02 / Birlem, Olav
Berhard-Rösler-Strasse 34
41366 Schwalmtal / DE
[2000/37]
Application number, filing date00103031.115.02.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateDE199910970305.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19909703
[2000/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035059
Date:13.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035059
Date:04.07.2001
[2001/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035059
Date:06.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65H63/06, G01B11/00, G01B11/10
[2001/26]
Former International [2000/37]B65H63/06
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   LI [2002/13]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur optischen Garnüberwachung[2000/37]
English:Device for optical yarn monitoring[2000/37]
French:Dispositif pour le contrôle optique d'un fil[2000/37]
Examination procedure04.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/11]
12.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2004Fee for grant paid
15.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.01.2005  12.05.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Uster Technologies AG
Wilstrasse 11
8610 Uster / CH
Opponent's representative
Ellenberger, Maurice
Uster Technologies AG Wilstrasse 11
8610 Uster / CH
 [2006/09]
Former [2005/13]
Opponent(s)01  21.01.2005  12.05.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Uster Technologies AG
Wilstrasse 11
8610 Uster / CH
Opponent's representative
Ellenberger, Maurice
Willi Studer AG Althardstrasse 30
8105 Regensdorf / CH
03.05.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.05.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.01.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.01.2006
10.01.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
09.02.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
19.02.2006Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[E]WO0007921  (LUWA AG ZELLWEGER [CH], et al) [E] 1-7 * page 1, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 5; figure -; claims 1-3 *;
 [A]DE3112812  (PEYER SIEGFRIED [CH]) [A] 1,2 * page 12; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5421529  (HANS POZZO [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 36; figure - *;
 [AD]DE1798297  (PHILIPS NV) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 57 - line 59 * * column 5, line 35 - line 44; figure 3 *;
 [AD]DE2621900  (RIETER AG MASCHF) [AD] 1 * page 9, paragraph 3; figure - *;
 [AD]DE7435828U  (SIEMENS AG) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim - *