EP1031660 - Screed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joseph Vögele AG Neckarauer Strasse 168-228 68146 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Joseph Vögele AG Neckarauer Strasse 168-228 D-68146 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munz, Roman Fränkelstrasse 5 67435 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Resch, Erich Eugen-Sigrist-Weg 5 68307 Mannheim / DE | [2000/42] |
Former [2000/35] | 01 /
Munz, Roman Leipziger Strasse 5 68723 Mannheim / DE | ||
02 /
Resch, Erich Eugen-Sigrist-Weg 5 68307 Mannheim / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103069.1 | 15.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | DE1999203338U | 24.02.1999 Original published format: DE 29903338 U | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031660 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031660 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/42 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
E01C19/42 (EP);
E01C2301/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/20] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bohle | [2000/35] | English: | Screed | [2000/35] | French: | Poutre lisseuse | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 01.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0493889 (BLAW KNOX CONST EQUIPMENT [GB]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2024900 (BLAW KNOX LTD) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0686729 (DYNAPAC GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract * |