Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035058

EP1035058 - Device for forming a start bunch in an automatic winder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.05.2005  [2005/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 601 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Murata Kikai Kabushiki Kaisha
3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin
Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawabata, Hirayuki
Oburan Sakamoto 402-go, 3-chome 33-ban 30 Sakamoto
Otsu-shi, Shiga / JP
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Liedl, Christine , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Liedl, Christine, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65
81369 München / DE
Application number, filing date00103092.315.02.2000
[2000/37]
Priority number, dateJP1999006109609.03.1999         Original published format: JP 6109699
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1035058
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1035058
Date:04.07.2001
[2001/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035058
Date:19.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65H54/34
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [2002/13]
Former [2000/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Bildung eines Anfangbündels in einem Spulautomat[2000/37]
English:Device for forming a start bunch in an automatic winder[2000/37]
French:Dispositif pour former un enroulement de démarrage dans un bobinoir automatique[2000/37]
Examination procedure17.12.2001Examination requested  [2002/08]
12.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2004Fee for grant paid
08.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US5535955  (ENGER JURGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 16 - line 57 * * column 4, line 13 - column 12, line 28; figure - *;
 [AD]JPH10297826  ;
 [A]US5681000  (GOEBBELS HEINZ-DIETE [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, [AD] 1 * abstract *