Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1033128

EP1033128 - Soft gelatin capsule manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  21.10.2011
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 23.11.2011  [2011/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R.P. Scherer GmbH
Gammelsbacher Strasse 2
69412 Eberbach / DE
For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2011/47]
Former [2008/25]For all designated states
R.P. Scherer GmbH
Gammelsbacher Strasse 2
69412 Eberbach / DE
For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
R.P. Scherer GmbH
Gammelsbacher Strasse 2
69412 Eberbach / DE
For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
R.P. Scherer GmbH
Gammelsbacher Strasse 2
69412 Eberbach / DE
For all designated states
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Brox, Werner
Gerhard-Hauptmann-Strasse 11
64743 Beerfelden / DE
02 / Zande, Horst
Schleifmühlweg 14
69436 Schönbrunn / DE
03 / Meinzer, Armin, Dr.
Fliederweg 2
79426 Buggingen / DE
[2000/36]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/47]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2000/36]Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date00103110.324.09.1994
[2000/36]
Priority number, dateDE1993433293128.09.1993         Original published format: DE 4332931
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1033128
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1033128
Date:28.02.2001
[2001/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1033128
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/25]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1033128
Date:23.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/48, A61K9/50, A61K38/13, A61J3/07
[2001/03]
Former International [2000/36]A61K9/48, A61K9/50, A61K38/13
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   GR,   IE,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
Extension statesSI16.02.2000
TitleGerman:Herstellung von Weichgelatinekapseln[2000/36]
English:Soft gelatin capsule manufacture[2000/36]
French:Procédé de production de capsules en gélatine molle[2000/36]
Examination procedure10.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
10.08.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
16.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2004Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
11.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
17.04.2008Fee for grant paid
17.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94115081.5  / EP0649651
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.03.2009  30.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
EMS S.A.
Rodovia SP 101 - KM 08
13186-481 Hortolandia - SP / BR
Opponent's representative
Bawden, Peter Charles, et al
Bawden & Associates
4 The Gatehouse
2 High Street
Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2009/51]
Opponent(s)01  16.03.2009  30.03.2009  ADMISSIBLE
EMS S.A.
Rodovia SP 101 - KM 08
13186-481 Hortolandia - SP / BR
Opponent's representative
Bawden, Peter Charles, et al
Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden
Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB
Former [2009/17]
Opponent(s)01  16.03.2009   
EMS S.A.
Rodovia SP 101 - KM 08
13186-481 Hortolandia - SP / BR
Opponent's representative
Bawden, Peter Charles, et al
Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden
Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB
23.04.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.01.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.02.2011Date of oral proceedings
15.03.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.03.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.07.2011Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.08.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
11.10.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition18.05.2011Appeal received No.  T1124/11
21.07.2011Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
17.04.2008Request for further processing filed
17.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
16.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
20.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
25.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 11
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 12
29.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 13
26.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 14
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[DYA]EP0121321  (SCHERER LTD R P [GB]) [DY] 1-18 * see especially the claims 1,2,4-6, and pages 5-6 * [A] 19-21;
 [Y]EP0539319  (SANDOZ LTD [CH]) [Y] 1-18 * see in particular example 4; and claims 1,20,27; page 6, lines 51-53 *
 [Y]  A.T.M. SERAJUDDIN ET AL.,, "Water migration from soft gelatin capsule shell to fill material and its effect on drug solubility", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (198601), vol. 75, no. 1, pages 62 - 64, XP002153386 [Y] 1-18 * see page 62, left column and page 64, left column *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600750114