blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1033231 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1033231



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 117
02.02.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
05.11.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.11.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.08.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.08.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.08.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.05.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.05.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
28.05.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
26.04.2003 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
27.02.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
27.02.2003 Description Search / examination 6
27.02.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.06.2002 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
09.04.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.03.2002 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
01.10.2001 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
28.09.2001 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
23.01.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.12.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
04.12.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.12.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
26.07.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
18.02.2000 Description Search / examination 15
18.02.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 Drawings Search / examination 4
18.02.2000 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.02.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
18.02.2000 Translation of priority document Search / examination 25