blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1033231


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.11.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.12.2004  [2004/52]
14.11.2003 (Expected) grant published on  02.01.2004  [2004/01]
14.08.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.08.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
23.05.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.03.2003 Examination report or reply
29.01.2003 Renewal fee
25.10.2002 First examination report
23.10.2002 Examination report or reply
24.06.2002 Loss of particular rights
27.02.2002 Loss of particular rights
09.01.2002 Renewal fee
21.12.2001 Change - extension states
21.09.2001 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
17.08.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  04.10.2001 [2001/40]
22.06.2001 Request for examination filed published on  08.08.2001 [2001/32]
01.12.2000 Publication of search report published on  17.01.2001 [2001/03]
01.12.2000 Change - classification published on  17.01.2001 [2001/03]
21.07.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.09.2000 [2000/36]